Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcmichael, Eddie, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Newton, Dane, Newton, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrumfield, Lorna H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1864 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied COUNTY OF KERN |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied COUNTY OF KERN |
|
August 19, 2013 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied Document Image |
|
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied Document Image |
|
December 21, 2010 | Hearing |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for MCMICHAEL EDDIE (PL-1). Received from EDDIE MCMICHAEL, check no(s) 2918. Receipt #564370 for amount of $25.00. |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for MCMICHAEL EDDIE (PL-1). Received from EDDIE MCMICHAEL, check no(s) 2918. Receipt #564370 for amount of $25.00. |
|
December 20, 2010 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued KERN EXECUTION / TRI STAR |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued KERN EXECUTION / TRI STAR |
|
April 06, 2010 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR |
|
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.