Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fbci, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Muren, Tara, against Short, Bonnie J, Short, Michael C, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3034 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2017 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
June 28, 2010 | Hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
March 24, 2010 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
March 05, 2010 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED |
|
February 05, 2010 | Hearing | Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause | |
January 27, 2010 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AUTO NOTICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $250,00 TO BE PAID BY /STAYED (30) DAYS (UNTIL 02/25/10) IF IN COMPLIANCE SANCTIONS WAIVED IF NOT DUE AND PAYABLE ON 03/01/10. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.740. HEARING SET 3/24/2010 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
January 27, 2010 | Hearing |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.