Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Goldberg Properties Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mccormack, Sandra Kuhn, against Ponce, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Brumfield, Lorna H. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3011 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2017 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
August 28, 2009 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA TRI STAR |
|
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued RETURNED VIA TRI STAR |
|
August 17, 2009 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial JUDGMENT FOR: GOLDBERG PROPERTIES JUDGMENT AGAINST: LINDA PONCE PLAINTIFF WAIVES ALL MONETARY DAMAGES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE *******SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUMFIELD******** JUDGMENT MAILED: 8/28/09 |
|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment after Trial JUDGMENT FOR: GOLDBERG PROPERTIES JUDGMENT AGAINST: LINDA PONCE PLAINTIFF WAIVES ALL MONETARY DAMAGES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE *******SIGNED BY JUDGE BRUMFIELD******** JUDGMENT MAILED: 8/28/09 |
|
August 11, 2009 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for GOLDBERG PROPERTIES INC (PL-1). Received from UNITED COMPANIES INCORPORATED, check no(s) 8589. Receipt #473717 for amount of $15.00. |
|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for GOLDBERG PROPERTIES INC (PL-1). Received from UNITED COMPANIES INCORPORATED, check no(s) 8589. Receipt #473717 for amount of $15.00. |
|
August 05, 2009 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: GOLDBERG PROPERTIES INC (PL-1) APPEARS BY SANDRA KUHN MCCORMACK. LINDA PONCE (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. PLAINTIFF WAIVES ALL MONETARY DAMAGES. INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT. WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 08/28/09 BY 5:00 PM. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE STIPULATED JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
August 05, 2009 | Hearing |
4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) New Calendar |
|
August 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) LINDA ANSWERED TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 1 HOUR Judge: Brumfield, Lorna H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.