Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Balboa Insurance Company, A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Haines, Todd F, against Bennett, Aubrey, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2009 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2016 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
January 10, 2011 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied AS TO AUBREY BENNETT |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied AS TO AUBREY BENNETT AS TO AUBREY BENNETT |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied AS TO AUBREY BENNETT |
|
August 27, 2010 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
July 02, 2010 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES /MONEY/DKR |
|
July 02, 2010 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES /MONEY/DKR COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES /MONEY/DKR |
|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES /MONEY/DKR |
|
June 29, 2010 | Hearing |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for BALBOA INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICE OF TODD F. HAINES, check no(s) 11792. Receipt #531894 for amount of $50.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.