Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Manufacturers Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Vogt, Mark A, against Moore, Cynthia C, Moore, Rick L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management193 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2008 |
Category06-Cl >10K <25K Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions222 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2407 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 06, 2009 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
September 14, 2009 | Hearing |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for MANUFACTURERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA HERITAGE PACIFIC LEASING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICE OF LANG, RICHERT & PATCH, check no(s) 073165. Receipt #480452 for amount of $25.00. |
|
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for MANUFACTURERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA HERITAGE PACIFIC LEASING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFICE OF LANG, RICHERT & PATCH, check no(s) 073165. Receipt #480452 for amount of $25.00. |
|
June 18, 2009 | Hearing | Abstract Issued | |
June 08, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Entry of Default by Court Entered AMENDED DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT: RICK L MOORE, AN INDIVIDUAL;CYNTHIA C MOORE, AN INDIVIDUAL; TO REFLECT THE CORRECTED BALANCE TOTAL OF $19,720.93 TO READ AS THE SAME AMOUNT ON THE JUDGMENT FILED ON 5-6-09 |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default by Court Entered AMENDED DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT: RICK L MOORE, AN INDIVIDUAL;CYNTHIA C MOORE, AN INDIVIDUAL; TO REFLECT THE CORRECTED BALANCE TOTAL OF $19,720.93 TO READ AS THE SAME AMOUNT ON THE JUDGMENT FILED ON 5-6-09 |
|
May 26, 2009 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice MATTHEW QUALL ESQ RE:REJECTION OF THE AMENDED REQUET FOR DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT, RC MOORE INC PAGE 2 , SIGNATURE OF ANNA CASTANON IS MISSING AND THE ATTORNEY'S SIGNATURE IS MISSING /DOCUMENTS MAILED BACK THIS DATE |
|
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice MATTHEW QUALL ESQ RE:REJECTION OF THE AMENDED REQUET FOR DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT, RC MOORE INC PAGE 2 , SIGNATURE OF ANNA CASTANON IS MISSING AND THE ATTORNEY'S SIGNATURE IS MISSING /DOCUMENTS MAILED BACK THIS DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.