Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Scott, La Tyce, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Johnson, Sharell, Tottress, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions87 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2638 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2015 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
December 18, 2015 | Hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
June 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) List DISPOSITION / DESTRUCTION LIST |
|
June 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Order-Destruction of Exhibits 5 YEAR DISPOSITION / DESTRUCTION |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order-Destruction of Exhibits 5 YEAR DISPOSITION / DESTRUCTION |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) List DISPOSITION / DESTRUCTION LIST |
|
January 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO LA TYCE SCOTT, JUDGMENT BY COURT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER. FORWARD TO 42521 BLOSSOM DR., LANCASTER, CA. 93536-4385. |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered AS TO LA TYCE SCOTT, JUDGMENT BY COURT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER. FORWARD TO 42521 BLOSSOM DR., LANCASTER, CA. 93536-4385. |
|
January 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered FORWARD TO NEW ADDRESS OF 42521 BLOSSOM DR., LANCASTER, CA. 93535 TO LA TYCE SCOTT. |
|
January 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered FORWARD TO NEW ADDRESS OF 42521 BLOSSOM DR., LANCASTER, CA. 93535 TO LA TYCE SCOTT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.