Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moreno, Josie, Moreno, Leo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dunphy, Ned E, against Ursua, Beatrice, represented by Mills, Beverly I, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management196 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2008 |
Category22-Cl >10K <25K Auto - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time2427 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2015 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 16, 2009 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
July 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
July 06, 2009 | Hearing |
4143 Jury Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
4143 Jury Trial/Final Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
June 05, 2009 | Hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.