Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Erin Capital Management Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Selikovitz, Moshe, against Mcinnerney, Mike, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Linda S. Etienne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2007 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time2526 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 24, 2008 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
June 18, 2008 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
June 12, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AUTO NOTICE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, MOSHE SELIKOVITZ, IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740. SANCTIONS TO BE PAID BY WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, MOSHE SELIKOVITZ, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.740 AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 6/12/08. HEARING SET 7/24/2008 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
June 12, 2008 | Hearing |
4182 Order to Show Cause - (N21a CRC 3.740) New Calendar |
|
June 12, 2008 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
June 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AUTO NOTICE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, MOSHE SELIKOVITZ, IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740. SANCTIONS TO BE PAID BY WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, MOSHE SELIKOVITZ, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.740 AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 6/12/08. HEARING SET 7/24/2008 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.