Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Beneficial California Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Paris, Jeffrey A, against Newman, Willie D, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateApril 30, 2007 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2655 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 29, 2007 | Hearing |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
August 23, 2007 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
July 16, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AUTO NOTICE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 TO BE PAID BY / WITHIN 10 DAYS OF NOTICE. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM CLERK'S OFFICE. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.110. HEARING SET 8/23/2007 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTY AS STATED ON ATTACHED DECLARATION. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
July 16, 2007 | Hearing |
4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) New Calendar |
|
July 16, 2007 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AUTO NOTICE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 TO BE PAID BY / WITHIN 10 DAYS OF NOTICE. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM CLERK'S OFFICE. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.110. HEARING SET 8/23/2007 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 14. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO PARTY AS STATED ON ATTACHED DECLARATION. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.