Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael S, against Moore, Sheila, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2007 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 22, 2009 | Hearing | Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction | |
October 23, 2008 | Hearing |
Declaration OF LOST WRIT THAT WAS ISSUED ON 11-15-07 FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED BY SHERIFFS DEPT OF LOS ANGELES |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF LOST WRIT THAT WAS ISSUED ON 11-15-07 FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED BY SHERIFFS DEPT OF LOS ANGELES |
|
November 19, 2007 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for LVNV FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT. Receipt #353989 for amount of $15.00. |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for LVNV FUNDING LLC (PL-1). Received from HUNT. Receipt #353989 for amount of $15.00. |
|
November 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES/ MONEY/DKR |
|
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES/ MONEY/DKR |
|
October 29, 2007 | Hearing |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.