Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Singh, Jogvinder, filed a(n) 39-Cl >10K <25K Other Judicial Review - Civil Limited case represented by Fennacy, John P, against Anan Trucking, A California Corp, represented by Khalsa, Gurujodha S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErrea, Larry A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2007 |
Category39-Cl >10K <25K Other Judicial Review - Civil Limited |
Time To Trial51 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions275 days |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time2648 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
December 15, 2009 | Hearing | Exhibit(s) Ordered Destroyed | |
October 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) Released to Plaintiff Exhibits mailed to Division of Labor Standards Enforcement. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) Released to Plaintiff Exhibits mailed to Division of Labor Standards Enforcement. |
|
October 01, 2009 | Hearing | Not Prop Disp Civil Case Exhibits | |
October 01, 2009 | Hearing |
Order for Return of Exhibits PJ (MBL) |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order for Return of Exhibits PJ (MBL) |
|
April 07, 2008 | Hearing |
Accounting Withdrawal of cash bail of $8,264.37 to Jogvinder Singh completed. |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Accounting Withdrawal of cash bail of $8,264.37 to Jogvinder Singh completed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.