Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Estrada, Ricardo, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Cardenas, Annette, represented by Gonzales, Jocelyn, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2007 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2702 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 19, 2007 | Hearing |
Stipulated Judgment INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY, SIGNED BY COMM ERREA |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Judgment INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY, SIGNED BY COMM ERREA |
|
February 21, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RICARDO ESTRADA (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ANNETTE CARDENAS (DE-1) APPEARS WITH JOCELYN GONZALES. PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. THE DEFENDANT AGREES TO AN INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED FORTHWITH WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 04/01/2007. THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO VACATE ON OR BEFORE 5 P.M. ON 03/31/2007, THE DEFENDANT WILL CLEAN THE INSIDE OF THE PROPERTY, BEFORE TURNING IN THE KEYS ON 03/31/2007. THE DEFENDANT ALSO WILL MAKE SURE THE FRONT AND BACK IS CLEAR OF DEBRIS. THE DEFENDANT IS NOT RESPOSIABLE FOR NORMAL WEAR AND TEAR, INCLUDING THE ELECTRICAL WIRING. PLAINTIFF WAIVES ALL RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES, COSTS, ATTORNEY FEES AND MISCELLANEOUS FEES. IF THE DEFENDANT(S) COMPLIES WITH THE ABOVE TERMS OF AGREEMENT, PLAINTIFF TO DISMISS THE ACTION IN ITS ENTIRETY.. IF THE DEFENDANT(S) FAIL TO COMPLY WITH THE AGREEMENT, THEN UPON PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT $2000.00 ( BACK RENT, COURT FEES AND COST) LESS ANY CREDITS . DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
February 21, 2007 | Hearing |
4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) New Calendar |
|
February 21, 2007 | Hearing |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)
Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) New Calendar |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: RICARDO ESTRADA (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ANNETTE CARDENAS (DE-1) APPEARS WITH JOCELYN GONZALES. PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. THE DEFENDANT AGREES TO AN INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT TO BE ENTERED FORTHWITH WRIT OF POSSESSION WILL ISSUE IMMEDIATELY, BUT THERE SHALL BE NO LOCKOUT BEFORE 04/01/2007. THE DEFENDANT HAS AGREED TO VACATE ON OR BEFORE 5 P.M. ON 03/31/2007, THE DEFENDANT WILL CLEAN THE INSIDE OF THE PROPERTY, BEFORE TURNING IN THE KEYS ON 03/31/2007. THE DEFENDANT ALSO WILL MAKE SURE THE FRONT AND BACK IS CLEAR OF DEBRIS. THE DEFENDANT IS NOT RESPOSIABLE FOR NORMAL WEAR AND TEAR, INCLUDING THE ELECTRICAL WIRING. PLAINTIFF WAIVES ALL RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES, COSTS, ATTORNEY FEES AND MISCELLANEOUS FEES. IF THE DEFENDANT(S) COMPLIES WITH THE ABOVE TERMS OF AGREEMENT, PLAINTIFF TO DISMISS THE ACTION IN ITS ENTIRETY.. IF THE DEFENDANT(S) FAIL TO COMPLY WITH THE AGREEMENT, THEN UPON PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT $2000.00 ( BACK RENT, COURT FEES AND COST) LESS ANY CREDITS . DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
February 08, 2007 | Hearing |
Notice of Trial New Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.