Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide, Flint C, against Mcguire, Melinda, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2018 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied COUNTY OF MARIN |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unsatisfied COUNTY OF MARIN |
|
July 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COJNTY OF MARIN/VIJ RETURNED VIA ACS BIN |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COJNTY OF MARIN/VIJ RETURNED VIA ACS BIN |
|
June 12, 2017 | Hearing | Memorandum of Costs and Credits | |
May 26, 2017 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
June 13, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
January 03, 2008 | Hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.