Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alderete, Carmen, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Stevens, Barbara A, against Adams, Barbara, Mcguire, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2006 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time2733 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
February 16, 2007 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ON 2/13/07 LETTER IN RE ADDRESS CHANGE: MY INSTRUCTIONS TO YOU WERE THAT A FORM CALLED NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE WOULD NEED TO BE COMPLETED AND SUBMITTED. CANNOT ACCEPT YOUR LETTER IN PLACE OF THE CHANGE FORM. CANNOT ACCEPT THE MANNER IN WHICH YOU NOTIFIED THE PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY. "NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS" FORM IS ATTACHED FOR YOUR CONVENIENCE. (MAILED TO COLORADO ADDRESS) |
|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ON 2/13/07 LETTER IN RE ADDRESS CHANGE: MY INSTRUCTIONS TO YOU WERE THAT A FORM CALLED NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE WOULD NEED TO BE COMPLETED AND SUBMITTED. CANNOT ACCEPT YOUR LETTER IN PLACE OF THE CHANGE FORM. CANNOT ACCEPT THE MANNER IN WHICH YOU NOTIFIED THE PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY. "NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS" FORM IS ATTACHED FOR YOUR CONVENIENCE. (MAILED TO COLORADO ADDRESS) |
|
January 24, 2007 | Hearing |
Judgment STIPULATED JUDGMENT BY COURT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER |
|
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment STIPULATED JUDGMENT BY COURT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER |
|
January 11, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CARMEN ALDERETE (PL-1) APPEARS WITH BARBARA A STEVENS. ANTHONY MCGUIRE (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. BARBARA ADAMS (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. THE CORRECT ADDRESS OF THE PROPERTY IS 510 REAL ROAD, # 2 BAKERSFIELD, CA PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT/STIPULATION. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANTS FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF 1245.18. THE DEFENDANTS HAS AGREED TO PAY PLAINTIFF AS FOLLOWS, PAY $103.76 ON 2/15/2007, PAY $103.76 OR MORE ON THE 15 TH OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL FOR THE TOTAL SUM OF $1245.18. IF ANY PAYMENT IS MORE THAN THIRTY DAYS LATE, THE ENTIRE AMOUNT WILL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE AND PAYABLE PLUS INTEREST AT THE LEGAL RATE. PLAINTIFF TO GIVE AN ITEMIZED DEPOSIT STATEMENT TO DEFENDANT WITHING THREE WEEKS AFTER DEFENDANTS VACATES THE PREMISES BY MAILE DEFENDANTS JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY AGREE TO VACATE THE PREMISES ON OR BEFORE 01/15/2007 RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT. ORDER IS SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE. |
|
January 11, 2007 | Hearing |
4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) New Calendar |
|
January 11, 2007 | Hearing |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) COMPLAINT ADDRESS: 510 REAL RD NOTICE ADDRESS: 501 REAL RD Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) COMPLAINT ADDRESS: 510 REAL RD NOTICE ADDRESS: 501 REAL RD Judge: Errea, Larry A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.