Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Guist, June, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Ornelas, James, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Errea, Larry A. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 12, 2006 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions50 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2733 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 22, 2008 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
February 01, 2007 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for GUIST, JUNE (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEYS MESSENGER SERVICE, check no(s) 3351. Receipt #292725 for amount of $15.00. |
|
February 01, 2007 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Issued | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for GUIST, JUNE (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEYS MESSENGER SERVICE, check no(s) 3351. Receipt #292725 for amount of $15.00. |
|
January 31, 2007 | Hearing |
Judgment after Trial JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF: JUNE GUIST JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT: JAMES ORNELAS RENT/DAMAGES: $1475.00 COSTS: $PER MEMORANDUM TOTAL: $1475.00 ***************LARRY ERREA 01/31/07********************* |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment after Trial JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF: JUNE GUIST JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT: JAMES ORNELAS RENT/DAMAGES: $1475.00 COSTS: $PER MEMORANDUM TOTAL: $1475.00 ***************LARRY ERREA 01/31/07********************* |
|
January 24, 2007 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JUNE GUIST (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JAMES ORNELAS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANT, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $1.475.00, COSTS $PER MEMORANDUM OF COSTS, ATTORNEY FEES $0, MISC FEES $0 FOR A TOTAL OF $1,475.00. RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT. COURT TO PREPARE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
January 24, 2007 | Hearing |
4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.