Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California Avenue Senior Housing, Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Peake, Alan J, against Cooke, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEtienne, Linda S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions37 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2988 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
February 28, 2006 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
February 09, 2006 | Hearing |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for CALIFORNIA AVENUE SENIOR HOUSING, LP (PL-1). Received from WALL WALL PEAKE, check no(s) 21614. Receipt #224846 for amount of $15.00. |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $15.00 for CALIFORNIA AVENUE SENIOR HOUSING, LP (PL-1). Received from WALL WALL PEAKE, check no(s) 21614. Receipt #224846 for amount of $15.00. |
|
February 03, 2006 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued HELD FOR AMS |
|
February 03, 2006 | Hearing |
Judgment After Hearing JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANT, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $514.00, COSTS $175.30, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, MISC FEES $25.00 (LATE FEES) FOR A TOTAL OF $714.30 WRIT TO ISSUE *PALMER* . |
|
February 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued HELD FOR AMS |
|
February 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment After Hearing JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF, AGAINST DEFENDANT, RENT/RENTAL DAMAGES $514.00, COSTS $175.30, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, MISC FEES $25.00 (LATE FEES) FOR A TOTAL OF $714.30 WRIT TO ISSUE *PALMER* . |
|
February 01, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1500 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: CALIFORNIA AVENUE SENIOR HOUSING, LP (PL-1) APPEARS BY ALAN J PEAKE. RAYMOND COOKE (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. DEFENDANT MAKES A MOTION PURSUANT TO CCP 1179 FOR RELIEF OF FORFEITURE. THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT DOES NOT FIND EVIDENCE OF REQUISITE HARDSHIP. MOTION DENIED. RESTITUTION OF PREMISES. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE. FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT. ALAN PEAKE TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.