Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Eugene Burger Management Corporation, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Russell, Michael D, against Rogers, Juanita, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2005 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions41 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3064 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 18, 2005 | Hearing | Dismissed Without Prejudice | |
November 18, 2005 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
November 15, 2005 | Hearing |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA SUNDANCE APARTMENTS (PL-1). Received from ALAN NEUMAN, check no(s) 12644. Receipt #208331 for amount of $7.00. |
|
November 15, 2005 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued HELD FOR ALAN NEUMAN |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA SUNDANCE APARTMENTS (PL-1). Received from ALAN NEUMAN, check no(s) 12644. Receipt #208331 for amount of $7.00. |
|
November 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued HELD FOR ALAN NEUMAN |
|
November 10, 2005 | Hearing |
Stipulated Judgment AN INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT BE ENTERED FOR A WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE TO REMOVE DEFENDANT JUANITA ROGERS FROM THE PREMISES. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE SHERIFF EXECUTE THOSE PROCEDURES FOR ENFORCEMENT OF THE WRIT AND SET THE LOCK DATE ON OR AFTER 12:00AM NOVEMBER 14TH 2005. *ETEINNE* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.