Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wright, John C, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vander Noor, Robert Bruce, against Brady, Bobby L, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etcheverry, Louis P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2014 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2014 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 03, 2013 | Hearing |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied AS TO KERN COUNTY |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Partially Satisfied AS TO KERN COUNTY |
|
October 13, 2009 | Hearing | Writ Returned Partially Satisfied | |
December 05, 2005 | Hearing |
117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 Amount of $7.00 for WRIGHT, JOHN C DBA BAKERSFIELD CREDIT CONTROL (PL-1). Received from BCC. Receipt #211582 for amount of $14.00. |
|
December 05, 2005 | Hearing |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for WRIGHT, JOHN C DBA BAKERSFIELD CREDIT CONTROL (PL-1). Received from BCC. Receipt #211582 for amount of $14.00. |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
117 Pmt: Abstract Issued / GC 26834 Amount of $7.00 for WRIGHT, JOHN C DBA BAKERSFIELD CREDIT CONTROL (PL-1). Received from BCC. Receipt #211582 for amount of $14.00. |
|
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for WRIGHT, JOHN C DBA BAKERSFIELD CREDIT CONTROL (PL-1). Received from BCC. Receipt #211582 for amount of $14.00. |
|
November 30, 2005 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/ DKR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.