Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Turner Crane Services Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Whittington, Michael T, against Sierra Concrete Corportation, represented by Tracey, Kirk S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etcheverry, Louis presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management148 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2004 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Rule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3338 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2013 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
August 16, 2005 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE THE COMPLAINT FILED BY TURNER CRANE SERVICES AGAINST SIERRA CONCRETE. CASE NUMBER S-1500-CL-195356 ONLY. FILED BY MICHAEL T WHITTINGTON, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TURNER CRANE SERVICES IN CASE NUMBER S-1500-CL-195356 *DISMISSAL FILED IN LEAD CASE # 252779 |
|
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE THE COMPLAINT FILED BY TURNER CRANE SERVICES AGAINST SIERRA CONCRETE. CASE NUMBER S-1500-CL-195356 ONLY. FILED BY MICHAEL T WHITTINGTON, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TURNER CRANE SERVICES IN CASE NUMBER S-1500-CL-195356 *DISMISSAL FILED IN LEAD CASE # 252779 |
|
January 26, 2005 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference ADVANCED FROM 2-28-05 AND SET IN DEPARTMENT 6 AT 8:00 A.M. BY JUDGE ANSPACH Judge: Etcheverry, Louis P. |
|
January 26, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference ADVANCED FROM 2-28-05 AND SET IN DEPARTMENT 6 AT 8:00 A.M. BY JUDGE ANSPACH Judge: Etcheverry, Louis P. |
|
November 18, 2004 | Hearing |
Stipulation AND ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION SIGNED BY COMM. ETECHEVERRY. |
|
November 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Stipulation AND ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION SIGNED BY COMM. ETECHEVERRY. |
|
November 03, 2004 | Hearing |
845E Pmt: Ltd. Civil First Appearance > $10,000 (1/1/04) Amount of $292.50 for SIERRA CONCRETE CORPORTATION (DE-1). Received from DEFENDANT, check no(s) 8676. Receipt #131604 for amount of $292.50. |
|
November 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
845E Pmt: Ltd. Civil First Appearance > $10,000 (1/1/04) Amount of $292.50 for SIERRA CONCRETE CORPORTATION (DE-1). Received from DEFENDANT, check no(s) 8676. Receipt #131604 for amount of $292.50. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.