Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Metals Usa Building Products, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hogan, Bruce W, against Sunrise Patios & Sunrooms, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2004 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions85 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3338 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2013 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
October 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
April 07, 2005 | Hearing |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding (After Trial) AS TO DEFT STOCKDALE CONSTRUCTION DBA PATIO & SUNROOMS FILED BY P KAVANAGH ESQ |
|
April 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding (After Trial) AS TO DEFT STOCKDALE CONSTRUCTION DBA PATIO & SUNROOMS FILED BY P KAVANAGH ESQ |
|
February 24, 2005 | Hearing |
Letter Received RE: DEBTOR HAS BEEN EXAMINED AND HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. |
|
February 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Letter Received RE: DEBTOR HAS BEEN EXAMINED AND HAS BEEN TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. |
|
February 14, 2005 | Hearing |
NP1095 Department: 17 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: KYLE JONES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR BRUCE W HOGAN ON BEHALF OF METALS USA BUILDING PRODUCTS (PL-1). PETER ROUSSEL IS PRESENT JUDGMENT DEBTOR SWORN AND RETIRED FROM THE COURTROOM FOR INFORMAL EXAMINATION. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 3/14/2005 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 17 DEBTOR PETER ROUSSEL IS ORDERED BACK. |
|
February 14, 2005 | Hearing |
4082 Debtors Examination New Calendar |
|
February 14, 2005 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause AS TO PETER ROUSSEL Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause AS TO PETER ROUSSEL Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.