Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arb Pine Brook Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Vining, Sheri Connelly, against Hooper, Rob, Stephens, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2003 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2012 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
September 10, 2010 | Hearing |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY FRANK P SAMPLES FOR DEBTOR JASON STEPHENS |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceeding FILED BY FRANK P SAMPLES FOR DEBTOR JASON STEPHENS |
|
September 19, 2003 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
September 09, 2003 | Hearing |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for ARB PINE BROOK LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 13651. Receipt #48873 for amount of $7.00. |
|
September 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for ARB PINE BROOK LLC (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 13651. Receipt #48873 for amount of $7.00. |
|
September 05, 2003 | Hearing | Writ of Possession | |
September 05, 2003 | Hearing | Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit | |
September 05, 2003 | Hearing | Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.