Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Household Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stebbins, Donald R, against Mestmaker, Cheryl J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2011 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
November 20, 2008 | Hearing | Writ Returned Unsatisfied | |
September 27, 2004 | Hearing |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for HOUSEHOLD BANK (PL-1). Received from IRWIN J ESKANOS, check no(s) 648210. Receipt #123925 for amount of $7.00. |
|
September 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
115 Pmt: Writs Issued GC 26828 Amount of $7.00 for HOUSEHOLD BANK (PL-1). Received from IRWIN J ESKANOS, check no(s) 648210. Receipt #123925 for amount of $7.00. |
|
September 17, 2004 | Hearing |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/ DKR |
|
September 17, 2004 | Hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 18 |
|
September 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 18 |
|
September 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued COUNTY OF KERN/ MONEY/ DKR |
|
August 24, 2004 | Hearing |
Memorandum of Costs and Credits FOR PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.