Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Placer County Public Guardian, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2008 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Other | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Supplement | |
January 27, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made | ||
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Other | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing - Guardianship or Conservatorship | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Amended | |
January 13, 2021 | Heard: Continued by Court | ||
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
December 09, 2020 | Heard: Continued by Parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.