Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Steve Young, Rodney Barron, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2006 |
CategoryProbate-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition | |
October 29, 2013 | Petition Granted | ||
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Other | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Document Other | |
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Document Other | |
June 01, 2010 | Petition Granted | ||
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.