Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anastasiya Coleman, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Tom Coleman, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2019 |
CategoryFamily Support-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
December 11, 2019 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Order After Hearing | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Motion | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Payment of Support | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Statement for Registration of California Support Order | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Registration of California Support Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.