Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cristi Simons, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Christopher Simons, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2009 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Order After Hearing | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Minutes | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Motion | |
July 01, 2015 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
September 22, 2010 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
May 29, 2009 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment Dissolution | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration Default (Disso, Legal Sep) | |
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Request Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.