Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Judith Martin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Gerald Martin, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2008 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2009 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full | |
March 30, 2009 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
January 29, 2009 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
December 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition Marriage, Legal Sep, Nullity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.