Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Debra Dove, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Jeffrey Ferguson, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2006 | Continued: Court | ||
February 24, 2006 | Continued: Stipulation | ||
February 15, 2006 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) | ||
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 24, 2006 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) | ||
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
January 17, 2006 | Continued: Stipulation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.