Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelly Bewley, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Robert Bewley, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2004 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2012 | Heard: Orders Made (Written) | ||
June 20, 2012 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) | ||
May 02, 2012 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
July 23, 2008 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
April 16, 2008 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) | ||
January 23, 2008 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) | ||
October 17, 2007 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) | ||
July 25, 2007 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) | ||
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 27, 2007 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.