Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Blue Diamond Growers, Kathy Gill, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Richard Gill, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2002 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Judgment Dissolution | |
May 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration Default (Disso, Legal Sep) | |
May 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration Disclosure | |
April 24, 2006 | Continued: Stipulation | ||
April 24, 2006 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
February 21, 2006 | Continued: Stipulation | ||
February 17, 2006 | Heard: Stipulation Entered | ||
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 13, 2005 | Continued: Court-No Judge/No Room (212120) | ||
September 07, 2005 | Case Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.