Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case represented by Felton, James R. Greenberg & Bass, Llp, against April Grossman, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2023 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a verified petition for approval for the transfer of payment rights. The petitioner, J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC, is seeking court approval to transfer certain structured settlement payment rights. The settlement agreement prov...
Order Other Ruling on Ex Parte Application - DENIED
Date: January 30, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 28, 2023Notice Hearing
Date: December 07, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: December 13, 2023Notice Continuance of hearing on petition for approval for transfer of payment rights
Date: November 16, 2023Petition Verified Petition for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights
Date: September 28, 2023Notice Hearing on Petition for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights
Date: September 28, 2023Notice Hearing
Date: November 16, 2023Notice Continuance
Date: December 07, 2023Notice Continuance
Date: November 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection (duplicate) | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion Other Requesting Execution of Order Approving Transfer of Payment Rights; Declaration of James R. Felton in Support Thereof | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application of Pet. J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC's Requesting Execution of Order Approving Transfer of Payment Rights; Declaration of James R. Felton in Support Thereof 03/11/24 | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Order PJ Notice Denying Proposed ORder | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection (eFiling) | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Other Ruling on Ex Parte Application - DENIED | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application of Petitioner, J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC's Requesting Execution of Order Approving Transfer of Payment Rights 01/30/24 | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Ruling on Submitted Matter on Petition for Approval Regarding Transfer of Payment Rights | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.