Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lisa Newman, Radhika Kasturi, Seshadri Kasturi, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case represented by Idleman, William Lubin Pham + Caplin Llp, Prendergast, Josiah Mark Weintraub Tobin Chediak Coleman & Grodin, against Adele Espana Purpur, Monte Claire Estates Homeowners Association, Radhika Kasturi, Seshadri Kasturi, represented by Chase Jr, Hal Law Offices Of Scott C Stratman, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2023 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Hearing
Date: February 20, 2024Minutes - Civil
Date: February 21, 2024Notice of Rejection
Date: February 15, 2024Motion Leave to Amend to File First Amended Answer to the Cross-Complaint
Date: December 21, 2023Attorney Substitution Namson N. Pham subs in for Josiah M. Prendergast
Date: August 28, 2023Notice Rejection
Date: August 28, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: August 24, 2023Attorney Change of Firm's Name
Date: August 23, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 8/28/2023
Date: August 14, 2023Answer Cross Complaint
Date: August 03, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 8/28/2023
Date: August 11, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 8/28/2023
Date: August 08, 2023Notice Demand for Jury
Date: June 27, 2023Answer
Date: June 27, 2023Complaint Cross
Date: July 07, 2023Summons Cross Complaint
Date: July 07, 2023Answer
Date: July 07, 2023Notice Acknowledgement of Receipt
Date: June 08, 2023Notice Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2023Complaint
Date: May 02, 2023Summons
Date: May 02, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of William Idleman in Support of Plaintiff & Cross-Defendants Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer to the Cross-Complaint | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Leave to Amend to File First Amended Answer to the Cross-Complaint | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution Namson N. Pham subs in for Josiah M. Prendergast | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Rejection | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney Change of Firm's Name | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement 8/28/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.