Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Michael Menchini, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mandel, Garret M. Porter Law Group Inc., against Cover-All Protective Structures, Llc, Robert Lair, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2022 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Conference Statement 04/10/23
Date: March 16, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance 5/03/2024
Date: April 12, 2024Notice Case Management Conference
Date: June 20, 2022Reply to Defendants Opposition to Remote Proceeding at Evidentiary Hearing or Trial
Date: April 25, 2024Case Management Conference Statement 10/17/22
Date: September 29, 2022Response to Ex Parte Appl for OST 04/18/24
Date: April 17, 2024Order Continuance
Date: March 26, 2024Ex Parte Application for Order Allowing Svc by Publication for Robert Shane Lair
Date: December 28, 2022Proof Service reply document 4/30/2024
Date: April 25, 2024Attorney Change of Handling Attorney From Jason A Rose to Garret M. Mandel
Date: October 10, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: July 07, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 20, 2022Order Attachment to Notice of Remote Appearance Granted for MSC on 5-3-24
Date: April 12, 2024Minutes - Civil
Date: October 14, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: February 02, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 06/12/2023
Date: May 22, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 02/06/2023
Date: January 20, 2023Attorney Substitution Pro Per subs out, Shumway subs in
Date: April 04, 2023Notice Entry of Order
Date: April 19, 2024Order Extension of Time
Date: December 02, 2022General Denial
Date: March 06, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 7/10/2023
Date: June 27, 2023Settlement Conference Statement
Date: April 23, 2024Notice Presiding Judge Denying service through SOS
Date: January 05, 2023Proof Service reply documents 4/30/2024
Date: April 25, 2024Minutes - Civil
Date: April 30, 2024Settlement Conference Statement
Date: April 17, 2024Proof Service Case Management Statement
Date: March 16, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: April 07, 2023Proof Service - UNSUCCESSFUL - Robert Shane Lair
Date: September 09, 2022Attorney Change of Handling Attorney
Date: February 13, 2024Proof Service 04/18/24
Date: April 16, 2024Summons
Date: June 20, 2022Response to Motion to Compel Responses without Objection from Robert Shane Lair
Date: April 23, 2024Proof Service- Summons Cover-all Protective Structures, LLC
Date: February 17, 2023Complaint
Date: June 20, 2022Proof Service- Summons ROBERT SHANE LAIR
Date: February 17, 2023Notice of Rejection (no exparte reserved)
Date: April 16, 2024Notice Presiding Judge Denying publication
Date: January 05, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: June 09, 2023Proof Service motion documents 5/14/2024
Date: March 29, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply to Defendants Opposition to Remote Proceeding at Evidentiary Hearing or Trial | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof Service reply document 4/30/2024 | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Support of Marco N. Sarkovich in Support of Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Hear Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Responses Without Objection from Robert Shane Lair | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof Service reply documents 4/30/2024 | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Hear Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Responses Without Objection from Robert Shane Lair | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference Statement | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Response to Motion to Compel Responses without Objection from Robert Shane Lair | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Order | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Other Shortening Time to Hear PLTF's Motion to COmpel Responses without Objections from Robert Shane Lair - GRANTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.