Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kimberly Silva, Robert Bauer, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case represented by Eison, Owili King Banafsheh, Danesh & Javid, Pc, against Robert Bauer, represented by Phillips, Robert K., in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2020 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Motion Consolidate -
Date: September 30, 2020Notice Demand for Jury -
Date: June 25, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 04, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 28, 2020Complaint Cross -
Date: June 25, 2020Complaint -
Date: May 15, 2020Proof Service- Summons -
Date: July 16, 2020Notice Errata -
Date: July 06, 2020Proof Service- Summons -
Date: June 11, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: August 25, 2020Answer -
Date: June 25, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: May 15, 2020Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: May 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2021 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
October 29, 2020 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Consolidate - | |
September 08, 2020 | Calendar Notes Adopted | ||
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement - | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons - | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Errata - | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Demand for Jury - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.