Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0044826 DUCHENEAUX, BLYTHE v. SYUFY PROPERTIES Plaintiff’s Motion for Final Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement The unopposed motion is granted. The court has broad discretion to determi... | |
December 09, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0044826 DUCHENEAUX, BLYTHE v. SYUFY PROP Plaintiff’s Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement The unopposed motion is granted. The court has broad discretion in determi... | |
November 04, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0044826 DUCHENEAUX, BLYTHE v. SYUFY PROP The motion for preliminary approval of class action and PAGA settlement is continued to Thursday, December 9, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 42. A stipul... | |
September 30, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0044826 DUCHENEAUX, BLYTHE v. SYUFY PROPERTIES The motion for preliminary approval of class action and PAGA settlement is continued to Thursday, November 4, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 42 to ... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.