Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
F & T Investments, Inc, Patricia Whitechat, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Patricia Whitechat, represented by Baiocchi, Joel C. Law Office Of Joel C. Baiocchi, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2020 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
This complaint is filed by F & T Investments, Inc., doing business as Duarte Construction, against Patricia D. Whitechat and Does 1 through 10. The complaint alleges several causes of action, including foreclosure of mechanic's lien, breach of contra...
Proof Service- Summons -
Date: May 20, 2020Complaint Cross -
Date: June 22, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: June 22, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 19, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 09, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 06, 2020Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: July 24, 2020Complaint -
Date: March 11, 2020Summons -
Date: March 11, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: March 11, 2020Declaration -
Date: June 05, 2020Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: March 11, 2020Answer -
Date: June 22, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: June 05, 2020Motion Stay -
Date: June 05, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: June 25, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0044610 F & T INVESTMENTS v. WHITECHAT, PATRICIA Plaintiff’s Motion for Attorneys’ Fees Ruling on Objections Defendant’s objection to the supplemental declaration is overruled. The court’s reques... | |
September 23, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0044610 F & T INVEST v. WHITECHAT, PATRICIA The motion for attorney’s fees is continued to Thursday, October 14, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 42 to be heard by the Honorable Michael W. Jones. ... | |
August 12, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0044610 F & T INVEST v. WHITECHAT, PATRICIA Plaintiff’s Motion for Attorneys’ Fees The motion is continued to Thursday, September 2, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 42. While the arbitrator denie... | |
January 26, 2021 | |||
October 20, 2020 | |||
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
September 10, 2020 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
August 20, 2020 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.