Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Standard Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Altura, Jordan S. Barger & Wolen Llp, against David Tefera, represented by Bender, Barbara J., in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior with Michael W. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2019 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Standard Insurance Company ("Standard") in interpleader against defendants David Tefera, Amanuel Tefera (a minor), and Hermela Tefera (a minor). Standard is an insurance company based in Oregon and is doing business in Cali...
Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: February 10, 2020Answer -
Date: February 27, 2020Request Default - Entered -
Date: February 24, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 27, 2020Order Appointment of Guardian ad Litem -
Date: February 18, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 26, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 04, 2020Notice -
Date: April 14, 2020Proof Service -
Date: June 03, 2020Notice Entry of Order -
Date: September 18, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 08, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 19, 2020Complaint -
Date: September 27, 2019Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: August 06, 2020Order Other -
Date: June 08, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: December 30, 2019Proof Service- Summons -
Date: November 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: September 27, 2019Proof Service- Summons -
Date: January 08, 2020Notice Acknowledgement of Receipt -
Date: November 15, 2019Notice Presiding Judge -
Date: December 23, 2019Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: September 27, 2019Summons -
Date: September 27, 2019Motion Leave -
Date: January 21, 2020Proof Service -
Date: January 31, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 10, 2020Stipulation Order -
Date: September 04, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: October 05, 2020Notice -
Date: October 22, 2020Request Default - Entered -
Date: November 02, 2020Proof Service- Summons -
Date: September 28, 2020Stipulation Order for Leave to File First Amended Complaint in Interpleader
Date: September 04, 2020Judgment Court Default against Def David Tefera
Date: January 24, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: June 28, 2021Notice Rejection by Clerk
Date: March 16, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 27, 2019Minutes - Civil
Date: December 10, 2021Proof Service- Summons Hermela Tefera
Date: November 15, 2019Declaration of Zina Yu in Support of Standard Insurance Company's Notice of Motion and Motion
Date: December 08, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: January 21, 2022Request Default - Entered David Tefera
Date: November 02, 2020Notice Rejection by Clerk
Date: February 10, 2020Notice Rejection by Clerk
Date: August 06, 2020Notice Presiding Judge Application for Appointment of GAL - Hermela Tefera - DENIED
Date: December 23, 2019Request Court Judgment Against David Tefera
Date: May 21, 2021Notice of Ruling re 7/21 CMC
Date: September 18, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: March 02, 2022Request Default - Entered David Tefera
Date: February 24, 2020Notice Acknowledgement of Receipt - Hermela Tefera
Date: November 15, 2019Proof Service- Summons Amanel Tefera
Date: November 15, 2019Motion Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds 2/27
Date: January 21, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: August 27, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: February 03, 2022Stipulation Commissioner PET, GAL
Date: September 13, 2021Notice Ruling re 08/30/2021 CMC
Date: September 02, 2021Proof Service- Summons David Tefera
Date: January 08, 2020Order Appointment of Guardian ad Litem Janet Welborn for Hermela Tefera
Date: February 18, 2020Request Default court judgment
Date: December 08, 2021Case Management Conference Statement 08/30/2021
Date: August 23, 2021Summons
Date: September 27, 2019Proof Service David Tefera
Date: January 31, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: June 30, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: February 26, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: July 09, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: October 19, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: February 02, 2022Notice Presiding Judge Application for Appointment of GAL - Amanuel Tefera - DENIED
Date: December 23, 2019Case Management Conference Statement 10/20/2020
Date: October 05, 2020Case Management Conference Statement 6/29/21
Date: June 24, 2021Proof Service OAH
Date: March 28, 2022Case Management Conference Statement 1/19/2021
Date: January 04, 2021Notice Continued State of Emergency
Date: April 14, 2020Proof Service motion documents 2/3/2022
Date: January 07, 2022Proof Service
Date: February 16, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: February 27, 2020Notice Entry of Order for Leave to File FAC in Interpleader
Date: September 18, 2020Complaint
Date: September 27, 2019Notice Telephone Appearance Instructions
Date: January 07, 2022Complaint 1st Amended in Interpleader
Date: September 18, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: September 10, 2021Proof Service- Summons David Tefera
Date: September 28, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: March 15, 2021Notice Acknowledgement of Receipt - Amanuel Tefera
Date: November 15, 2019Minutes - Civil
Date: March 14, 2022Case Management Conference Statement 07/21/2020
Date: July 08, 2020Notice Case Management Conference
Date: June 30, 2021Proof Service motion documents 1/6/2022
Date: December 08, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: January 05, 2022Answer
Date: February 27, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: January 15, 2021Proof Service
Date: December 10, 2021Notice of Ruling re 10/20/20 CMC
Date: October 22, 2020Notice Case Management Conference
Date: September 27, 2019Minutes - Civil
Date: June 04, 2020Notice Entry of Judgment
Date: February 16, 2022Reply PLAINTIFF’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT FUNDS
Date: May 29, 2020Case Management Conference Statement 1-14-20
Date: December 30, 2019Minutes - Civil
Date: July 20, 2020Order Appointment of Guardian ad Litem Janet Welborn for Amanuel Tefera
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Conference Statement - 12/13/2021
Date: December 10, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: January 10, 2020Stipulation Commissioner
Date: January 21, 2022Order Re Leave to Seek Default Judgment in D.42 with Judge Jones
Date: October 19, 2021Proof Service Amended - Motion docs - Jason Wellborn
Date: June 03, 2020Reply -
Date: May 29, 2020Notice -
Date: September 18, 2020Complaint 1st Amended -
Date: September 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Order GRANTING STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY’S MOTION FOR 1. DISCHARGE OF LIABILITY; AND 2. RECOVERY OF ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof Service OAH | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Rejection by Clerk | |
March 15, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0043710 Standard Insurance Company vs. Tefera, David Motion for Discharge of Liability and Dismissal Plaintiff Standard Insurance Company’s motion for discharge of liability is granted. Plaintiff... | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
March 03, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0043710 STANDARD INS CO v. TEFERA, DAVID The motion to dismiss is continued to Tuesday, March 15, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 40 to be heard by Commissioner Trisha J. Hirashima. | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof Service | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Judgment | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.