Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Perminder Bisla, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Title, American Pacific Mortgage Corporation Doe 1, Harjoyte Bisla, Victoria Bisla, represented by Ring, Lawrence Thomas Law Offices Of Larry T. Ring, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2019 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
This complaint is seeking an order of partition, accounting, and contribution for a property located in Rocklin, California. The plaintiff, Perminder Bisla, holds a 50% ownership interest in the property and is also seeking a monetary judgment for fr...
Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 29, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: February 14, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 05, 2019Answer -
Date: August 28, 2019Proof Service- Summons -
Date: February 28, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 09, 2019Fee Waiver Order Full -
Date: August 30, 2019Answer -
Date: August 27, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: May 24, 2019Proof Service- Summons -
Date: February 22, 2019Request Default - Not Entered -
Date: February 14, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: March 02, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 13, 2019Proof Publication -
Date: July 10, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 06, 2020Complaint -
Date: January 22, 2019Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: March 06, 2020Proof Service -
Date: July 29, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: April 10, 2020Notice Pendency of Action -
Date: April 10, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 23, 2020Order Publication -
Date: March 17, 2020Proof Service- Summons -
Date: August 19, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 10, 2020Proof Service -
Date: June 22, 2020Notice -
Date: April 23, 2020Proof Service- Summons -
Date: April 15, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: October 07, 2020Proof Service -
Date: October 07, 2020Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: January 22, 2019Motion Summary Judgment -
Date: October 07, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 19, 2020Request Default - Entered -
Date: September 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: January 22, 2019Summons -
Date: January 22, 2019Ex Parte Application -
Date: March 16, 2020Request Default - Entered -
Date: October 28, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: October 01, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: October 07, 2020Declaration Support -
Date: October 07, 2020Statement -
Date: October 07, 2020Complaint Amendment -
Date: August 05, 2020Request Default - Not Entered -
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0042407 Bisla, Perminder vs. Bisla, Harjoyte ** NOTE: telephonic appearances are strongly encouraged Appearance required. | |
October 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | S-CV-0042407 Bisla, Perminder vs. Bisla, Harjoyte, et al Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Plaintiff and cross-defendant Perminder Bisla’s (“plaintiff’s”) request for judicial notice is granted. However, th... | |
June 01, 2021 | |||
May 21, 2021 | |||
April 16, 2021 | |||
February 05, 2021 | Heard: Taken Under Submission | ||
January 29, 2021 | Continued: Plaintiff/Petitioner | ||
January 08, 2021 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
November 09, 2020 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
October 30, 2020 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.