Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
George Taylor, Victoria Enriquez, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Ford Motor Co., Future Ford, Inc., represented by Efstratis, Harry Paul Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp, Hugret, Spencer Peter Gordon & Rees Llp, Mcnulty, Elizabeth Vanis Taylor Anderson Llp, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2018 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Answer -
Date: December 10, 2018Proof Service- Summons -
Date: December 10, 2018Attorney Substitution -
Date: May 30, 2019Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: June 03, 2019Notice -
Date: January 08, 2019Order Other -
Date: April 11, 2019Attorney Substitution -
Date: May 24, 2019Summons -
Date: November 20, 2018Document Other -
Date: November 29, 2018Document Other -
Date: November 20, 2018Declaration -
Date: November 20, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: June 24, 2019Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: November 20, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: June 19, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 05, 2019Attorney Association of Counsel -
Date: September 18, 2019Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: June 26, 2019Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: January 30, 2020Notice -
Date: January 30, 2020Declaration -
Date: January 23, 2020Attorney Substitution -
Date: January 24, 2020Disqualification Order Acknowledging by Court -
Date: November 29, 2018Attorney Substitution -
Date: October 17, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: October 25, 2019Declaration -
Date: October 25, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: January 30, 2020Order Ruling on Submitted Matter -
Date: August 14, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: November 07, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: November 20, 2019Reply -
Date: November 14, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: February 21, 2020Ex Parte Application -
Date: January 31, 2020Notice Entry of Order -
Date: February 04, 2020Stipulation -
Date: January 31, 2020Order Continuance of Trial -
Date: January 31, 2020Stipulation Order -
Date: June 15, 2020Reply -
Date: February 27, 2020Opposition -
Date: July 31, 2020Opposition -
Date: January 31, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 10, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: March 04, 2020Declaration -
Date: July 10, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 24, 2020Declaration -
Date: July 21, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 13, 2020Order -
Date: October 13, 2020Declaration -
Date: July 14, 2020Ex Parte Application -
Date: October 09, 2020Reply -
Date: August 06, 2020Answer 1st Amended Complaint -
Date: August 26, 2020Motion Compel -
Date: July 10, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: November 13, 2020Motion Summary Judgment -
Date: November 13, 2020Statement -
Date: November 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | |||
June 18, 2021 | |||
June 11, 2021 | |||
April 22, 2021 | |||
March 25, 2021 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
March 11, 2021 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
February 08, 2021 | Continued: Defendant/Respondent | ||
January 29, 2021 | Continued: Defendant/Respondent | ||
January 28, 2021 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
January 22, 2021 | Continued: Defendant/Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.