Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Laurie Deuschel, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against City Of Rocklin, Clear Point Financial Group, Inc., Kamyshin Investments, Inc., Pacific Gas And Electric Co., represented by Brunello, James Louis, Horan, Stephen E. Porter Scott, A Professional Corporation, Moya, Mario Alberto Moya Law Firm, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof Service -
Date: September 15, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: December 11, 2017Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 06, 2018Fee Waiver Order Full -
Date: December 11, 2017Complaint 1st Amended -
Date: February 22, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: April 18, 2018Proof Service -
Date: April 03, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: April 30, 2019Notice Hearing -
Date: January 29, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 22, 2019Reply -
Date: May 21, 2019Summons Amended Complaint -
Date: February 22, 2019Proof Service- Summons -
Date: April 03, 2019Answer 1st Amended Complaint -
Date: April 02, 2019Declaration -
Date: March 29, 2019Notice Hearing -
Date: April 03, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: May 13, 2019Notice -
Date: May 03, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: April 29, 2019Notice Stay of Proceedings -
Date: May 29, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: May 30, 2019Disqualification CCP170.1 Court's Own Motion -
Date: May 29, 2019Proof Service -
Date: May 29, 2019Objection -
Date: May 17, 2019Demurrer -
Date: May 03, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: May 11, 2020Summons -
Date: December 11, 2017Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 18, 2019Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: December 11, 2017Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 01, 2018Notice Hearing -
Date: August 09, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: November 18, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: May 21, 2020Declaration -
Date: July 29, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: July 29, 2020Proof Service -
Date: May 21, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: May 13, 2020Proof Service -
Date: May 28, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 26, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: May 03, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 22, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: August 12, 2020Objection -
Date: August 28, 2020Reply -
Date: August 28, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: May 13, 2019Notice Acknowledgement of Receipt -
Date: May 13, 2019Objection -
Date: May 13, 2019Proof Service -
Date: May 17, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: February 13, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: August 05, 2020Notice -
Date: August 05, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: March 02, 2020Notice -
Date: July 29, 2020Demurrer -
Date: July 29, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: May 22, 2020Notice Termination or Modification of Stay -
Date: August 28, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 19, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 16, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: September 04, 2020Proof Service -
Date: September 16, 2020Document Other -
Date: September 16, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 28, 2020Complaint 2nd Amended -
Date: October 16, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 25, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 28, 2020Answer 2nd Amended Complaint -
Date: November 17, 2020Proof Service -
Date: November 17, 2020Demurrer -
Date: November 20, 2020Proof Service -
Date: July 30, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: November 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Statement of Decision | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion for Order Granting Relief with Accompanying Declaration of Karen Pine | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof Service of Opposition to Moiton for Relief | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Rudy Santos | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Relief notice of motion and motion for order granting relief; memorandum of points and authorities | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.