Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Curtis Thordsen, filed a(n) Civil case against Denise Stein, represented by Mellon, Gillian Ryan Pillemer & Pillemer, Munter, Gavan Rhys Tiza Serrano Thompson & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions393 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time393 days |
In Limine Motion -
Date: January 12, 2018Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: January 17, 2018Document Other -
Date: January 25, 2018Witness List -
Date: January 12, 2018Brief Trial -
Date: January 12, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 04, 2018Statement -
Date: January 12, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 11, 2018Jury Trial Expense Form -
Date: January 26, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 26, 2018Tentative Ruling -
Date: January 26, 2018Exhibit List -
Date: January 26, 2018Jury Instructions Used & Filed -
Date: January 31, 2018Settlement Conference Statement -
Date: December 27, 2017Declaration Support -
Date: March 27, 2018Jury Instructions Proposed & Not Used -
Date: January 31, 2018Judgment Amended -
Date: June 01, 2018Settlement Conference Statement -
Date: December 29, 2017Minutes - Civil -
Date: March 20, 2018Memorandum Costs -
Date: February 15, 2018Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: February 20, 2018Notice -
Date: February 09, 2018Verdict Used Verdict Form REDACTED -
Date: January 31, 2018Notice -
Date: February 22, 2018Declaration Support -
Date: February 20, 2018Notice Entry of Judgment -
Date: January 31, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 09, 2018Reply -
Date: March 20, 2018Document Other -
Date: March 22, 2018Document Other -
Date: January 31, 2018Judgment After Trial -
Date: January 31, 2018Opposition -
Date: March 02, 2018Proof Service -
Date: March 02, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: April 09, 2018Attorney Substitution -
Date: August 01, 2018Order -
Date: July 25, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: April 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution - | |
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order - | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Amended - | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Amended | |
May 01, 2018 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
May 01, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
This tentative ruling is issued by the Honorable Charles D. Wachob. If oral argument is requested it shall be heard on May 1, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. in Department 42. Motion to Tax Costs Plaintiff’s Motio...
Judge: Charles D. Wachob |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.