Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Burkett'S Pool Plastering, Inc., Dal Pino Quality Pools, Inc., Neil O. Anderson And Associates, Inc, Karen Lester, Tim Lester, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Baugh, Andrew Michael Berding & Weil Llp, Milani, Anthony Ronald Anthony R. Milani & Associates Inc., Stone, Colette F. Stone & Associates, Williams, Evan David Law Office Of Evan D. Williams, against Dal Pino Quality Pools, Inc., Neil O. Anderson And Associates, Inc, represented by Braunstein, Carla N Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, Kravitz, Jeffrey S. Kravitz & Chan, Llp, Mcelroy, Julie Diane Jacobsen & Mcelroy, Mcelroy, Julie Diane Jacobsen & Mcelroy Pc, Milani, Anthony Ronald Anthony R. Milani & Associates Inc., (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions490 days |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
This complaint is filed by Burkett's Pool Plastering, Inc. against several cross-defendants. The cross-complainant alleges that the cross-defendants, including Dal Pino Quality Pools, Inc., McCann Plastering, Inc., McCann Contracting, Inc., Delta Gun...
Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: January 31, 2018Stipulation -
Date: March 05, 2018Declaration -
Date: January 31, 2018Attorney Substitution -
Date: October 02, 2017Request Default - Not Entered -
Date: August 01, 2018Document Other -
Date: February 02, 2018Request Default - Not Entered -
Date: August 02, 2018Request Default - Not Entered -
Date: August 24, 2018Request Default - Not Entered -
Date: July 26, 2018Order -
Date: March 05, 2018Notice Entry of Order -
Date: March 12, 2018Ex Parte Application -
Date: March 05, 2018Request Default - Entered -
Date: September 17, 2018Proof Service- Summons -
Date: November 19, 2018Request Default - Entered -
Date: November 19, 2018Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: July 19, 2018Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: January 25, 2019Motion Compel -
Date: July 20, 2018Ex Parte Application -
Date: July 20, 2018Declaration -
Date: July 20, 2018Declaration Support -
Date: July 20, 2018Opposition -
Date: July 20, 2018Attorney Substitution -
Date: April 29, 2019Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: February 25, 2019Ex Parte Application -
Date: July 27, 2018Request Default - Not Entered -
Date: June 27, 2018Proof Service -
Date: July 20, 2018Order Continuance of Trial -
Date: July 27, 2018Order -
Date: July 20, 2018Notice Entry of Order -
Date: July 30, 2018Proof Service- Summons -
Date: July 26, 2018Opposition -
Date: July 31, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 01, 2018Reply -
Date: August 06, 2018Reply -
Date: August 03, 2018Order Compel -
Date: August 15, 2018Declaration Support -
Date: August 06, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 08, 2018Notice -
Date: December 27, 2018Proof Service- Summons -
Date: September 17, 2018Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: January 17, 2019Stipulation Order -
Date: January 07, 2019Ex Parte Application -
Date: January 25, 2019Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: January 17, 2019Motion Leave -
Date: January 25, 2019Notice Errata -
Date: April 29, 2019Ex Parte Application -
Date: May 15, 2019Request Judicial Notice -
Date: May 15, 2019Declaration -
Date: January 25, 2019Order -
Date: January 25, 2019Notice Entry of Order -
Date: January 25, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 06, 2019Complaint Intervention -
Date: February 22, 2019Stipulation Order -
Date: January 30, 2019Summons Cross Complaint -
Date: February 08, 2019Complaint Cross -
Date: February 08, 2019Proof Service -
Date: February 15, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: May 15, 2019Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: February 28, 2019Attorney Substitution -
Date: March 01, 2019Order Other -
Date: May 15, 2019Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: April 29, 2019Notice Entry of Order -
Date: May 21, 2019Motion Continuance (Trial) -
Date: May 15, 2019Declaration -
Date: May 15, 2019Proof Service -
Date: May 21, 2019Ex Parte Application -
Date: May 30, 2019Order -
Date: May 30, 2019Complaint 1st Amended -
Date: May 30, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 09, 2019Proof Service- Summons -
Date: June 05, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 12, 2019Notice -
Date: June 10, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 03, 2019Notice -
Date: May 30, 2019Summons Amended Complaint -
Date: May 30, 2019Answer 1st Amended Complaint -
Date: July 01, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: June 26, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 08, 2019Answer 1st Amended Complaint -
Date: July 03, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 12, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 15, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 09, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 22, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 16, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 11, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 11, 2019Motion Amend -
Date: December 26, 2019Declaration Support -
Date: January 10, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: October 09, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 23, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 19, 2019Declaration Support -
Date: January 16, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 30, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: September 17, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: December 26, 2019Request Judicial Notice -
Date: March 12, 2020Declaration -
Date: December 26, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 08, 2020Motion Summary Judgment -
Date: January 10, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: January 10, 2020Attorney Association of Counsel -
Date: March 13, 2020Opposition -
Date: March 12, 2020Statement -
Date: March 12, 2020Proof Service -
Date: January 10, 2020Statement -
Date: January 10, 2020Order Ruling on Submitted Matter -
Date: February 28, 2020Opposition -
Date: January 16, 2020Reply -
Date: January 27, 2020Proof Service -
Date: January 23, 2020Document Other -
Date: March 06, 2020Declaration Support -
Date: January 27, 2020Declaration Supplemental -
Date: January 27, 2020Complaint Cross Amendment -
Date: March 06, 2020Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: February 19, 2020Proof Service -
Date: March 12, 2020Declaration -
Date: March 20, 2020Proof Service -
Date: March 20, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: April 08, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: April 15, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: April 13, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: March 20, 2020Reply -
Date: March 20, 2020Attorney Substitution -
Date: April 06, 2020Notice -
Date: April 23, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 20, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 24, 2020Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 22, 2020Complaint Cross -
Date: March 12, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 27, 2020Proof Service- Summons -
Date: April 09, 2018Proof Service- Summons -
Date: April 11, 2018Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: July 30, 2020Proof Service- Summons -
Date: April 13, 2018Dismissal Partial Without prejudice -
Date: May 25, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 10, 2020Complaint Cross -
Date: April 14, 2020Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: May 12, 2020Ex Parte Application -
Date: May 21, 2020Ex Parte Application -
Date: May 07, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 22, 2020Notice Entry of Order -
Date: May 27, 2020Order Leave to Intervene -
Date: May 11, 2020Notice Entry Dismissal -
Date: June 08, 2018Proof Service- Summons -
Date: April 05, 2018Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: June 29, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 26, 2020Answer Cross Complaint -
Date: May 13, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 29, 2020Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: March 13, 2018Summons Cross Complaint -
Date: March 20, 2018Notice Entry of Order -
Date: May 13, 2020Notice Withdrawal -
Date: July 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | |||
March 05, 2021 | |||
February 26, 2021 | |||
August 11, 2020 | Heard: Trial Date Set | ||
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement - | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement - | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement - | |
July 23, 2020 | Heard: Dropped | ||
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.