Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carole Potter, William Potter, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case represented by Shepardson, Scott S. Ongaro Pc, against Corporation Magnussen Dodge, A California, Liability Fca Us Llc, A Delaware Limited, represented by Shepardson, Scott S. Ongaro Pc, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2016 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Statement -
Date: January 26, 2018Document Other -
Date: August 24, 2018Proof Service -
Date: January 31, 2018Brief Trial -
Date: September 28, 2018Document Other -
Date: April 05, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: March 28, 2019Statement -
Date: March 29, 2019Motion Attorney's Fees -
Date: August 23, 2019Opposition -
Date: January 31, 2018Witness List -
Date: September 28, 2018Order -
Date: February 06, 2018Statement -
Date: August 24, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 23, 2018Statement of Case -
Date: September 28, 2018Ex Parte Application -
Date: February 06, 2018Notice Change of Address -
Date: June 29, 2018Declaration -
Date: February 06, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 28, 2018Attorney Substitution -
Date: September 26, 2018Brief Trial -
Date: August 24, 2018In Limine Motion -
Date: September 28, 2018Proof Service -
Date: September 26, 2018In Limine Opposition -
Date: September 26, 2018Declaration -
Date: October 10, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: August 23, 2019In Limine Opposition -
Date: April 03, 2019Notice -
Date: December 17, 2018Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 18, 2018In Limine Motion -
Date: September 21, 2018Proof Service -
Date: September 21, 2018Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: March 26, 2019Witness List -
Date: March 29, 2019Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: March 02, 2020Order Attorney's Fees -
Date: June 01, 2020Statement of Case -
Date: March 29, 2019Brief Trial -
Date: March 29, 2019In Limine Motion -
Date: March 26, 2019Proof Service -
Date: March 26, 2019Order Ruling on Submitted Matter -
Date: January 09, 2020Memorandum Costs -
Date: August 23, 2019Opposition -
Date: September 06, 2019Motion Tax Costs -
Date: September 11, 2019Declaration -
Date: September 06, 2019Declaration -
Date: September 13, 2019Reply -
Date: September 13, 2019Objection -
Date: October 10, 2019Document Other -
Date: September 13, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: September 18, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: December 05, 2019Reply -
Date: October 17, 2019Opposition -
Date: October 10, 2019Declaration -
Date: December 06, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: November 14, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 24, 2019Document Other -
Date: November 21, 2019Witness List -
Date: March 23, 2018Brief Trial -
Date: March 23, 2018Attorney Address Change Notice -
Date: August 30, 2017Witness List -
Date: September 22, 2017Proof Service -
Date: September 07, 2017Attorney Address Change Notice -
Date: September 07, 2017Proof Service -
Date: August 30, 2017Statement -
Date: September 22, 2017In Limine Motion -
Date: January 26, 2018Witness List -
Date: January 26, 2018Declaration -
Date: April 02, 2018Brief Trial -
Date: January 26, 2018Declaration Support -
Date: January 26, 2018Ex Parte Application -
Date: April 02, 2018Statement -
Date: March 23, 2018In Limine Motion -
Date: March 23, 2018Proof Service -
Date: March 28, 2018Order -
Date: April 02, 2018Brief Trial -
Date: September 22, 2017In Limine Motion -
Date: September 22, 2017Stipulation -
Date: October 26, 2017Stipulation Order -
Date: October 26, 2017Notice Entry of Judgment -
Date: October 02, 2017Proof Service -
Date: September 27, 2017Opposition -
Date: September 27, 2017Proof Service -
Date: September 22, 2017Minutes - Civil -
Date: January 26, 2018Notice -
Date: December 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Attorney's Fees - | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Attorney's Fees | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Rejection by Clerk - | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Rejection by Clerk | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Ruling on Submitted Matter - | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Ruling on Submitted Matter | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration - | |
December 06, 2019 | Heard: Taken Under Submission | ||
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.