Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Karen Nayyar, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Bmw Of North America, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 02, 2016 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2017 | Not Heard: Settled (413310) | ||
August 29, 2017 | Not Heard: Dismissed | ||
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full With Prejudice | |
June 30, 2017 | Continued: Court (412110) | ||
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
June 23, 2017 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
April 25, 2017 | Petition Granted (435220) | ||
August 30, 2016 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Questionnaire Case Mngmnt Conf. | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Questionnaire Case Mngmnt Conf. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.