Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Insurance State Farm Mutual Automobile, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Joshua Frisbee, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full With Prejudice | |
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof Service- Summons | |
November 05, 2013 | Heard: Dismissed | ||
September 17, 2013 | Heard: Continued (Orders Made) (432120) | ||
July 23, 2013 | Continued by Court: Other | ||
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.