Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aubrey Mass, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Encon Energy Conservation Co., Vy Truong, Melinda Zaputil, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2013 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
November 22, 2013 | Not Heard: Settled (413310) | ||
November 15, 2013 | Not Heard: Settled (413310) | ||
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
April 30, 2013 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Jury Fees Received | |
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Jury Fees Received | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Jury Fees Received | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.