Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Services Builders Advantage Insurance, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Cal-Pro Commercial Ins. Services, Cal-Pros C.I.S. Inc., Jamy Cox, Rob Courtade, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2008 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2009 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
April 17, 2009 | Not Heard: Vacated (413210) | ||
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismissal Full With Prejudice | |
March 10, 2009 | Motion Granted (434210) | ||
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 09, 2009 | Motion Denied (434110) | ||
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Document Other | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution | |
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution | |
September 09, 2008 | Dropped from Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.