Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Adrienne Devlin, Gerald Devlin, California Hardwood Producers, Inc., Johnson Premium Hardwood Flooring,, Murphy Maier General Contractor, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against California Hardwood Producers, Inc., Johnson Premium Hardwood Flooring,, Murphy Maier General Contractor, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2008 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2010 | Heard: Dismissed | ||
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment Satisfaction of Judgment Full | |
February 04, 2010 | Fail to Appear:Bench Wrrnt Issued | ||
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 22, 2009 | Heard: Tentative Ruling Adopted | ||
July 10, 2009 | Heard: Settled | ||
July 09, 2009 | Trial: Full Day | ||
July 08, 2009 | Trial: Full Day | ||
July 07, 2009 | Jury Sworn: Trial Begins | ||
July 06, 2009 | Continued by Court: Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.