Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Engineering & Asphalt, Inc, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Vanguard Lending Group, Inc., Sycamore Ventures, Lp, American River Bank, Sycamore Ventures, Llc., Sycamore Miramonte, Llc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution | |
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment Other | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Attorney Substitution | |
July 31, 2007 | Heard: Dismissed | ||
July 10, 2007 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
June 10, 2007 | Set in Error | ||
June 01, 2007 | Not Heard: Settled (413310) | ||
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice Hearing | |
May 25, 2007 | Heard: Settled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.