Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Daniel Buttler, Clint Buttler, Marla Buttler, Thomas Butler, filed a(n) Civil-Roseville case against Ronald Zinke, Brian Zinke, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2004 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2005 | Not Heard: Dismissed | ||
January 18, 2005 | Dropped from Calendar | ||
December 15, 2004 | Docket Event | Order Sanctions | |
December 13, 2004 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
November 15, 2004 | Heard: Continued (432110) | ||
October 22, 2004 | Docket Event | General Denial | |
October 01, 2004 | Docket Event | Complaint 1st Amended | |
October 01, 2004 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 21, 2004 | Heard: Tentative Ruling-No Appear | ||
September 07, 2004 | Docket Event | Arbitration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.